Canil, Christina Maria Bruna (CPSO#: 70351)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Mar 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7700 Ext. 70185
Fax: (613) 247-3511
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christina Canil Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 13 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Canil ( CPSO# 70351 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Regional
Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-7700

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 05 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINA MARIA BRUNA CANIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CANIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Jul 2003
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2001