Canisius, Elisabeth (CPSO#: 81100)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Russian

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
25 Charlton Avenue, suite 604
Hamilton ON  L8N-1Y2
Phone: (905) 523-6766
Fax: (905) 523-7526
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 10 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELISABETH CANISIUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CANISIUS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2011