Canning, Aidan William Noel (CPSO#: 25353)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Nov 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 07 Nov 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aidan Canning Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 19 2013

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ireland

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 07 Nov 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 07 Nov 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from November 7, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Aidan William Noel
            Canning, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Canning to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. AIDAN WILLIAM NOEL CANNING
                                          ("Dr. Canning)
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended;
                  
                  "CPD" means continuing professional development;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Canning, certificate of registration number 25353, am a member of
                  the College. I acknowledge that the College has inquired into my
                  compliance with the requirement to participate in a program of CPD.    

            (3)   I, Dr. Canning, have ceased to practise medicine due to retirement and I
                  am entering into this Undertaking as an alternative to complying with the
                  CPD requirement under section 29 of Ontario Regulation 114/94 (made under
                  the Medicine Act, 1991). 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Canning, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   I, Dr. Canning, undertake that, effective immediately, I will not
                  practise medicine in any jurisdiction until each and every one of the
                  following conditions have been met:

                  (a)   I provide a minimum of forty-five (45) days' notice to the College
                        of my intent to return to the practice of medicine; 
                  
                  (b)   I provide the College with proof that I am participating in a
                        program of CPD that meets the requirements for CPD of the Royal
                        College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada, the College of Family
                        Physicians of Canada, or an organization that has been approved by
                        the College for that purpose that meets the requirements for CPD
                        set by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or
                        the College of Family Physicians of Canada; and
                  
                  (c)   The College approves my return to the practice of medicine.
                  
            (6)   I, Dr. Canning, undertake that upon signing this Undertaking I shall
                  forward a request to the General Manager of OHIP that my billing number
                  be deactivated for services rendered after the date I cease to practise
                  and before the date the College agrees that I may return to practise in
                  accordance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (7)   I, Dr. Canning, undertake to abide by the College's Policy on Practice
                  Management Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to Practise, Take an
                  Extended Leave of Absence or Close Their Practice Due to Relocation, a
                  copy of which is attached hereto as Appendix "A". 

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENTS

            (8)   I, Dr. Canning, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Canning, acknowledge that in considering my request to return to
                  practice, the College may, among other things:

                  (a)   request that I agree to specified terms, limitations or conditions
                        being placed upon my certificate of registration; and
                  
                  (b)   request that I enter into an appropriate assessment and/or
                        monitoring agreement with the College.
                  
            (10)  I, Dr. Canning, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for
                  payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Canning, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (12)  I, Dr. Canning, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (13)  I, Dr. Canning, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code.

            (14)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Canning, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Canning, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. Canning has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in
                              any jurisdiction and therefore cannot see any patients or
                              provide any medical advice or services.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Canning, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and any person who or institution that may
                  have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (16)  I, Dr. Canning, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "B" and that the consent forms part of this
                  Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: November 7, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Aidan William Noel Canning to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 7, 2018:

Dr. Canning has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in any jurisdiction and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.