Cantle, Paul Michael (CPSO#: 96795)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus Room A-280 1053 Carling Avenue Ottawa, ON K1Y 4E9
Date Received: 15 Jul 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 26 Sep 2011 to 23 Oct 2011
Elective Trainee - Vascular Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jul 2015