Cao, Ying Kathy (CPSO#: 84639)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 494-7455
Fax: (416) 494-4833
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mount Sinai Hospital Eye Clinic
Ground Floor, Room L1-040
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 5151
Fax: (416) 586-8789
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kathy Cao Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Cao ( CPSO# 84639 )

Business Address:
202 - 1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 494-7455

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital Eye Clinic
Ground Floor, Romm L1-040
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YING KATHY CAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2011