Cape, Hunter Robert (CPSO#: 93383)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Mar 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Mar 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College of Dublin, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
G1 - 16 O'Brien St
Orillia ON  L3V 5S2
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hunter Cape Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 16 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Cape ( CPSO# 93383 )

Business Address:
G1 - 16 O'Brien Street
Orillia ON  L3V 5S2
Phone Number: (705) 259-6300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HUNTER ROBERT CAPE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAPE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2016