Cappello, Emma Michele (CPSO#: 84267)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional Health Science
Department of Anesthesia
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E.M. Cappello Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 02 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Cappello ( CPSO# 84267 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Science
Department of Anesthesia
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMMA MICHELE CAPPELLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAPPELLO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011