Cappello, Marie Lena (CPSO#: 81073)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Oct 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201-1260 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 0A1
Phone: (807) 626-1234
Fax: (807) 623-8832
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marie Cappello Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cappello ( CPSO# 81073 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
1260 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 0A1
Phone Number: (807) 626-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jul 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIE LENA CAPPELLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAPPELLO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 13 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 14 Dec 2009 to 17 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2010