Capra, Louise Margaret Anne (CPSO#: 77231)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Nov 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Nov 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 05 Nov 2005
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 06 Nov 2005 to 31 Mar 2006
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Nov 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Mar 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 May 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Nov 2006