Caraiscos, Valerie Bessy (CPSO#: 88778)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jan 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Valerie B. Caraiscos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Caraiscos ( CPSO# 88778 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jan 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VALERIE BESSY CARAISCOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARAISCOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 15 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Jan 2011 to 15 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2012