Carfagnini, Gregory Peter (CPSO#: 85184)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Apr 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
525 Simpson st.
Thunder Bay ON  P7C 3J6
Phone: (807) 622-8235
Fax: (807) 622-3548
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

980 Oliver Rd.
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: (807) 684-6000
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

2-141 Syndicate Ave.
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 1C6
Canada
Phone: (807) 625-5400
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carfagnini Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 10 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Carfagnini ( CPSO# 85184 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Emergency Dept
980 Oliver Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6100

Business Address:
2 - 140 Syndicate Avenue South
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 1E1
Phone Number: (807) 625-5400

Business Address:
69 Court Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4T7

Business Address:
125 Hogan Road
Nipigon ON  P0T 2S0

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY PETER CARFAGNINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARFAGNINI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 2009