Carlson, Pamela Sue (CPSO#: 96210)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 May 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 May 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dalby Family Practice
PO Box 3000
21 Hamilton Street
Elora ON  N0B 1S0
Phone: 226-369-0264
Fax: 226-369-0246
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Groves Memorial Community Hospital
235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Canada
Phone: (519) 843-2010
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pamela S. Carlson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 26 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Carlson ( CPSO# 96210 )

Business Address:
Dalby Family Practice
143 Metcalfe Street
2nd Floor
P.O. Box 3085
Elora ON  N0B 1S0
Phone Number: (226) 369-0264

Business Address:
235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Phone Number: (519) 843-2010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jul 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAMELA SUE CARLSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARLSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 04 Jul 2011 to 17 Jul 2011
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 18 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 2013