Carlsson, Anthony Mark (CPSO#: 73674)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jul 2005