Carmichael, Scott Alvin Garnet (CPSO#: 97930)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury ON  P3E 1X3
Phone: (705) 675-5900
Fax: 705-671-3031
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Scott Carmichael Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Carmichael ( CPSO# 97930 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Psychiatry
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SCOTT ALVIN GARNET CARMICHAEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARMICHAEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017