Caron, Sharine Colleen (CPSO#: 73556)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
McMaster University
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Pain Care Clinics
701 Main St. W unit 100
Hamilton ON  L8S 1A2
Canada
Phone: (289) 768-7246
Fax: (289) 779-2273
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bentley & Dr. Caron Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Caron ( CPSO# 73556 )
Dr. T. Bentley ( CPSO# 73472 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
McMaster University
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L9L 2X2

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6

Business Address:
Holbrook Building Out-Pt Dept
Sanitorium Road
Hamilton ON  L9C 1C4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARINE COLLEEN CARON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Oct 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Nov 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 14 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2001