Carrier, Heather Noelle (CPSO#: 76108)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance
St. Marys Memorial Hospital
267 Queen Street West
St Marys ON  N4X1C4
Phone: (519) 284-1332
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Noelle Carrier Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Carrier ( CPSO# 76108 )

Business Address:
Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 272-8200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Grey Bruce Health Services,Lions Head Site Lions Head
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital Southampton
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Haliburton Site Haliburton
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER NOELLE CARRIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARRIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2003