Carriere, Christopher Gordon (CPSO#: 90956)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Nov 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 28 Nov 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Nov 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 28 Nov 2018 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Christopher Gordon Carriere may practise medicine independently in family
            medicine, only.