Carroll, Allison Brianne (CPSO#: 90210)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 22 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 09 Feb 2009 to 05 Mar 2009
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Mar 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016