Carruthers, Angela Marie (CPSO#: 65735)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Emergency Department
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone: (705) 324-6111
Fax: (705) 328-6164
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Angela Carruthers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Carruthers ( CPSO# 65735 )

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
Emergency Department
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-6111

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Northwest Territories
Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELA MARIE CARRUTHERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARRUTHERS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1992