Carstensen, Heinrich Michael (CPSO#: 88966)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Collingwood General
& Marine Hospital
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Phone: (705) 445-2550 Ext. 8678
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. M. Carstensen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Carstensen ( CPSO# 88966 )

Business Address:
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Phone Number: (705) 445-2550

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEINRICH MICHAEL CARSTENSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARSTENSEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013