Cartagena, Ana Milagro (CPSO#: 88477)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Feb 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Feb 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.M. Cartagena Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 05 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. U. Jolly ( CPSO# 88481 )
Dr. A. Cartagena ( CPSO# 88477 )

Business Address:
Neurocardiac Associates
302 - 564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone Number: (519) 742-0495

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANA MILAGRO CARTAGENA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARTAGENA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2014