Carter, Alexandra Judith Elizabeth (CPSO#: 77327)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 07 Mar 2002 to 03 Apr 2002
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 07 Apr 2005 to 01 Jun 2005
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Nov 2005 to 14 Dec 2005
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Apr 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 2012