Carter, Flloyd Patrick (CPSO#: 94680)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of the West Indies, Barbados, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2011 to 08 Mar 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 09 Mar 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2012