Carter, Jonathan Mathew (CPSO#: 95304)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
First Avenue Family Medical Centre
6 First Avenue
St Thomas ON  N5R 4M2
Phone: (519) 633-6050
Fax: (519) 633-6053
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Elmwood Place
46 Elmwood Pl
London ON  N6J 1J2
Canada
Phone: 519-433-7259
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Dearness Home
710 Southdale Road
London ON  N6C4R2
Canada
Phone: 519-661-0400
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jonathan Carter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Carter ( CPSO# 95304 )

Business Address:
First Avenue Family Medical Centre
6 First Avenue
St Thomas ON  N5R 4M2
Phone Number: (519) 633-6050

Business Address:
46 Elmwood Place
London ON  N6J 1J2
Phone Number: (519) 433-7259

Business Address:
710 Southdale Road
London ON  N6E 1R8
Phone Number: (519) 661-2500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN MATHEW CARTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2013