Carter, Kyle William (CPSO#: 95309)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southwest Middlesex Health Centre
22262 Mill Road
Mount Brydges ON
London ON  N0L 1W0
Phone: (519) 264-2800
Fax: (519) 264-2742
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kyle William Carter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 16 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Carter ( CPSO# 95309 )

Business Address:
Southwest Middlesex Health Centre
22262 Mill Road
Mount Brydges ON  N0L 1W0
Phone Number: (519) 264-2800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 16 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KYLE WILLIAM CARTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2013