Carter, Paul Stephen (CPSO#: 91624)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Oxford University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ambulatory care clinic
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Ave W, Mississauga
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: 905 813 2744
Fax: (905) 813-4536
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 501
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Canada
Phone: 4162897300
Fax: 4162894256
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL STEPHEN CARTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2016