Carter, Teresa Annunziata (CPSO#: 77255)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Teresa Carter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Carter ( CPSO# 77255 )

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
Health Science Centre
1280 Main Street West
Room 3A
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Medical Records Location

Address: McMaster Children's Hospital 1200 Main St W Hamilton, ON L8N 3Z5
Date Received: 12 Jun 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 16 Oct 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 08 Jan 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 08 Jan 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 08 Jan 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 20 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2017