Caryl, William Goldstein (CPSO#: 95770)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Oct 2015

Summary

Former Name: Goldstein, William Caryl (used until: 17 Oct 2011 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:Ben Gurion University of the Negev, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Salz and Caryl Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 19 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Salz ( CPSO# 100175)
Dr. W. Caryl ( CPSO# 95770 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Elignton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM GOLDSTEIN CARYL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARYL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 17 Oct 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 18 Oct 2011 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 06 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2015