Casaubon, Leanne Kelly (CPSO#: 73866)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN / Toronto Western Hospital
Div. of Neurology - Stroke Program
WW5-448
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5685
Fax: (416) 603-5768
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Leanne K. Casaubon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Casaubon ( CPSO# 73866 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Div. of Neurology - Stroke Program
WW5-448
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5685

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEANNE KELLY CASAUBON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASAUBON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004