Casella, Tesha Elysia (CPSO#: 92829)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: Olsen, Tesha Elysia (used until: 14 Jul 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Uxbridge Cottage Hospital
4 Campbell Dr.
Uxbridge ON  L9P 1S4
Phone: (905) 852-9771
Fax: (905) 862-2006
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tesha Casella Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 12 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Casella ( CPSO# 92829 )

Business Address:
4 Campbell Drive
Uxbridge ON  L9P 1S4
Phone Number: (905) 852-9771

Business Address:
Unit B
2 Elgin Park Drive
Uxbridge ON  L9P 0B1
Phone Number: (905) 852-1009

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 10 Oct 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TESHA ELYSIA CASELLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASELLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2012