Cashman, Frank Emil (CPSO#: 24446)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Oct 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Oct 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
400 Walmer Rd.
Park Towers East
Suite 122
Toronto ON  M5P 2X7
Phone: (416) 356-5179
Fax: (416)8504372
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 18 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Oct 2018

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: January 15, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

NOTE: This decision has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)