Cassar, Nagib Lambert (CPSO#: 28921)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Cairo, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Curel Med Clinic 180 - 2021 Atwater Ave Montreal, QC H3H 2P2
Date Received: 25 May 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jan 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018