Casselman, Ronald Charles (CPSO#: 21593)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 11 Shepherds Cir St Catharines, ON L2T 2C8
Date Received: 08 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 03 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Mar 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018