Cassidy, Caitlin Margaret Rose (CPSO#: 91177)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Oct 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Parkwood Institute
Main Building D4-101N
550 Wellington Rd
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone: (519) 646-6000 Ext. 45027
Fax: (519) 685-4009
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cassidy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 09 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cassidy ( CPSO# 91177 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Care London
21 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 1Y6

Business Address:
LHSC - Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioner's Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9

Business Address:
Thames Valley Children's Centre
779 Base Line Road East
London ON  N6C 5Y6

Business Address:
Parkwood Institute
Main Building
D4-101 N
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone Number: (519) 646-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 12 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAITLIN MARGARET ROSE CASSIDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASSIDY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 12 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Sep 2013 to 11 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 12 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2014