Cassidy, Walter Joseph (CPSO#: 21286)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Apr 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Apr 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Docudavit Solutions Inc. 28 Eugene St Toronto ON M6B 3Z4 www.docudavit.com Tel: 416-781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338 Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083
Instructions: Patients should contact Docudavit Solutions Inc. to request a copy of their medical record.
Date Received: 29 Mar 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 18 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Apr 2018