Cassol, Clarissa Araujo (CPSO#: 95232)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: Araujo Cassol, Clarissa (used until: 05 Sep 2016 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Federal Univ of Santa Catarina, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Toronto General Hospital Department of Pathology 200 Elizabeth Street Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Date Received: 10 May 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 27 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 28 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jun 2017