Castano Herrera, Elkin Dario (CPSO#: 78746)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Pontificia Bolivariana, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
835 King Street West
P O Box 9056 Station C
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 744-7361
Fax: (519) 744-7363
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natasha Yepes Restrepo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 13 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Yepes Restrepo ( CPSO# 79369 )
Dr. E. Castano Herrera ( CPSO# 78746 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
715 Fischer Hallman Road
Kitchener ON  N2E 4E9
Phone Number: (519) 745-6556


Corporation Name: Castano Herrera Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 13 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Yepes Restrepo ( CPSO# 79369 )
Dr. E. Castano Herrera ( CPSO# 78746 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
P.O. Box 9056 Station C
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 744-7361

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELKIN DARIO CASTANO HERRERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASTANO HERRERA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 24 Mar 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 25 Mar 2003 to 28 Sep 2003
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 29 Sep 2003 to 29 Mar 2004
International Specialist Physician - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Sep 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Mar 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008