Castel, Saulo (CPSO#: 78732)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:University of Sao Paulo, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue, FG43a
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4202
Fax: (416) 480-6878
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Castel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Castel ( CPSO# 78732 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite F603
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4202

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Brazil

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jul 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAULO CASTEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASTEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 30 Dec 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
International Specialist Physician - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008