Castellucci, Lana Antoinette (CPSO#: 84595)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lana Castellucci Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Castellucci ( CPSO# 84595 )

Business Address:
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone Number: (613) 938-4240

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall General Hospital Cornwall
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LANA ANTOINETTE CASTELLUCCI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASTELLUCCI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 27 Sep 2010 to 24 Oct 2010
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 28 Mar 2011 to 08 May 2011
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2011