Castro, Marina de Sousa (CPSO#: 94078)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Nov 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 18 Nov 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Escola de Medicina e Saude Publica, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Hospital
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Brazil

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 16 Sep 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 28 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 27 Nov 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 28 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Nov 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 16 May 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Marina de Sousa Castro may practise medicine only as required by the
                  clinical  fellowship  program  in  neonatal-perinatal medicine program in
                  which Dr. Castro is enrolled in the Department of Paediatrics, University
                  of Toronto;

            2.    Dr.  Castro shall prescribe drugs only  for  in-patients and out-patients
                  of  a  clinical  teaching  unit  that  is  formally affiliated  with  the
                  department where Dr. Castro is properly practising  medicine and to which
                  postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of
                  its program of postgraduate medical education;

            3.    Dr. Castro shall not charge a fee for medical services; and

            4.    The certificate expires on June 30, 2019.