Catapano, Joseph (CPSO#: 95813)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Div of Plastic Surgery & Recon Surg
Department of Surgery
University of Toronto
149 College Street, Fl 5 Rm 508
Toronto ON  M5T 1P5
Phone: (416) 978-8534
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Critical Care Unit
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH CATAPANO shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. CATAPANO is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. CATAPANO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CATAPANO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. CATAPANO shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. CATAPANO is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. CATAPANO no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Dec 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 May 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 May 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019