Cathers, Christopher Royden (CPSO#: 92259)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Dec 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
66 Josephine Street
North Bay ON  P1B 0A7
Phone: (705) 495-2685
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. R. Cathers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cathers ( CPSO# 92259 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
66 Josephine Street
North Bay ON  P1B 0A7
Phone Number: (705) 495-2685

Business Address:
50 College Drive
PO Box 2500
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER ROYDEN CATHERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CATHERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 16 Nov 2009 to 07 Feb 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 08 Feb 2010 to 15 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 16 Nov 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 20 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2011