Cattran, Meeka Lee (CPSO#: 87018)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: MacMillan, Meeka Lee (used until: 08 Nov 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sandy Hill Community Health Centre
221 Nelson St.
Ottawa, ON
K1N 1C7
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone: (613) 789-8450
Fax: (613) 789-8710
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEEKA LEE CATTRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CATTRAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009