Caulfeild, Jonathan David (CPSO#: 76408)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 7205
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 372-1807
Fax: (519) 372-2401
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Gibbons and Caulfeild, Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gibbons ( CPSO# 79412 )
Dr. J. Caulfeild ( CPSO# 76408 )

Business Address:
Suite 2000
1415 1st Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone Number: (519) 470-3030

Business Address:
Suite 7205
1800 - 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 372-1807

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN DAVID CAULFEILD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAULFEILD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006