Caumartin, Yves (CPSO#: 85229)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Transplantation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Transplantation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2008