Cavalcante Lima Filho, Jose Hermenio (CPSO#: 92635)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 25 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:Universidade Federal Do Ceara, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Michael DeGroote School of Medicine
Department of Medicine HSC 3W10
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4L8
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of Medicine
Division of Dermatology
1200 Main St. West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76084
Fax: (905) 521-5051
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hermenio Lima Filho Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Cavalcante Lima Filho ( CPSO# 92635 )

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Department of Medicine
Division of Dermatology
Hamilton ON  L8S 4J9
Phone Number: (905) 521-5051

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre,Regional Rehabilitation Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 25 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 25 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSE HERMENIO CAVALCANTE LIMA FILHO may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DIVISIONS OF DERMATOLOGY AND CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY AND ALLERGY, DEPARTMENT OF MEDICINE, MCMASTER UNIVERSITY in which Dr. CAVALCANTE LIMA FILHO holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. CAVALCANTE LIMA FILHO may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. CAVALCANTE LIMA FILHO no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. CAVALCANTE LIMA FILHO no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. CAVALCANTE LIMA FILHO no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Apr 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2014