Cavalier, Lisa Lorraine (CPSO#: 58185)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Nov 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Nov 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1988
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jan 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2006
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 20 Mar 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Dec 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Feb 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Apr 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2015
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 22 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Nov 2016