Caza, Gregoire Francois (CPSO#: 72485)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Aug 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Phone: (613) 432-4851
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Caza Stevens Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Caza ( CPSO# 72485 )
Dr. L. Stevens ( CPSO# 83976 )

Business Address:
Perth & Smiths Falls District Hospital
60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9
Phone Number: (613) 282-2330

Business Address:
Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 432-4851

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGOIRE FRANCOIS CAZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAZA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2001