Cellarius, Victor (CPSO#: 75498)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Mar 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Mar 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Temmy Latner Centre for
Palliative Care
Mount Sinai Hospital
Box 13 - 60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 7885
Fax: (416) 586-4804
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Baker Cellarius Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Baker ( CPSO# 75529 )
Dr. M. Baker ( CPSO# 24505 )
Dr. V. Cellarius ( CPSO# 75498 )

Business Address:
St Michaels Hospital
Pediatric Clinic
2nd Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 867-3655

Business Address:
Temmy Latner Centre for Palliative Care
Mount Sinai Hospital
4th Floor
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VICTOR CELLARIUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CELLARIUS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 27 Jul 2000 to 22 Aug 2000
Elective Trainee - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Aug 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2002