Cenic, Aleksa (CPSO#: 77581)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Serbian

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
McMaster Clinic Wing
237 Barton Street East
Room 730
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 46781
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Aleksa Cenic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cenic ( CPSO# 77581 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
McMaster Clinic Wing
Room 730
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEKSA CENIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CENIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2011